US HB4363 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a daily public reporting requirement for covered contract awards of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Contract Reporting Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-120. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5545-5546) |
2021-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4363. |
2021-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5545-5547) |
2021-09-29 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 86. |
2021-09-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-121. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2021-07-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.