US HB4355 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for military construction, the Department of Veterans Affairs, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Military Construction, Veterans Affairs, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56. |
2021-07-02 | House | The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-81, by Ms. Wasserman Schultz. |
2021-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.
SB2604 (Related) 2021-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
SB2604 (Related) 2021-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 114.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4355/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4355/BILLS-117hr4355rh.pdf |