US HB4347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the Federal Government's planning and preparation for extreme weather and the Federal Government's dissemination of best practices to respond to extreme weather, thereby increasing resilience, improving regional coordination, and mitigating the financial risk to the Federal Government from such extreme weather, and for other purposes.
Title
PREPARE Act of 2019 Preparedness and Risk Management for Extreme Weather Patterns Assuring Resilience and Effectiveness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546. |
2020-12-17 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2020-12-17 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-12-17 | House | Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology for a period ending not later than Dec. 17, 2020 for consideration of such provisions of the bill as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(p) of rule X. |
2020-12-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-662, Part I. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations