US HB4333 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the authority granted to the Department of Homeland Security and Department of Justice with respect to unmanned aircraft systems and unmanned aircraft, and for other purposes.
Title
Safeguarding the Homeland from the Threats Posed by Unmanned Aircraft Systems Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] |
Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Shri Thanedar [D-MI] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] |
Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] | Sen. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence. |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Accountability. |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Homeland Security, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1631 (Same As) 2023-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4333/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4333/BILLS-118hr4333ih.pdf |