US HB4330 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements related to U.S. cooperation with International Criminal Police Organization (INTERPOL) communications. No U.S. agency or department may arrest an individual based solely on an INTERPOL notice without (1) prior validation of the individual's eligibility for extradition, (2) a diplomatic request for arrest from the requesting country, and (3) an arrest warrant. A U.S. agency or department may not use an INTERPOL communication from an INTERPOL member country that does not have a bilateral extradition treaty with the United States as the sole basis for certain actions, such as detaining an individual or denying an individual a visa, without verifying that the communication likely comports with INTERPOL's constitution. The bill requires reports on countries that abuse INTERPOL communications for political motives and other unlawful purposes.
Title
TRAP Act of 2019 Transnational Repression Accountability and Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2019-09-16 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1153) |
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2483 (Same As) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Human rights
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4330/BILLS-116hr4330ih.pdf |