US HB4293 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to modify testing requirements applicable to bank holding companies and certain nonbank financial companies, including by: (1) establishing limitations on Comprehensive Capital Analysis and Review by the Federal Reserve Board, (2) reducing the frequency of stress testing from semiannual to annual, and (3) otherwise revising provisions related to stress testing. (Sec. 4) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.
Title
Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 136 (Y: 188 N: 231 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - On passage RC# 137 (Y: 245 N: 174 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - On passage RC# 137 (Y: 245 N: 174 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-11 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 174 (Roll no. 137). (text: CR H3112) |
2018-04-11 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 188 - 231 (Roll no. 136). |
2018-04-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3128-3129) |
2018-04-11 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Maxine Waters motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Maxine Waters demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day. |
2018-04-11 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-04-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Maxine Waters motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to require stronger semi-annual stress tests for any global systemically important bank holding company or subsidiary that has engaged in a pattern of unsafe banking practices or any other violations related to consumer harm. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ms. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H3118) |
2018-04-11 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-04-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4293. |
2018-04-11 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules. |
2018-04-11 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 780. (consideration: CR H3112-3119) |
2018-03-15 | House | Rule H. Res. 780 passed House. |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 780 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules. |
2018-03-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-593. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 38 - 21. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR780 (Related) 2018-03-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial crises and stabilization