US HB428 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Red River Gradient Boundary Survey Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to commission a survey to identify the South Bank boundary line with respect to land along a specified 116-mile stretch of the Red River in Oklahoma and Texas (the affected area). The survey shall: adhere to the gradient boundary survey method; span the length of the affected area; be conducted by surveyors who are licensed and qualified to conduct official gradient boundary surveys, and selected by and operating under the direction of the Texas General Land Office and the Oklahoma Commissioners of the Land Office (the offices); and be completed within two years of enactment of this bill. The BLM shall submit the survey to the offices for approval. The offices shall determine whether to approve the survey within 60 days after receiving it. Surveys of individual parcels in the affected area shall be conducted according to the requirements for the survey of the South Bank boundary line. A parcel survey also shall be approved or disapproved by the offices within 60 days of receipt. Neither the South Bank boundary survey nor any parcel survey shall be submitted to the BLM for approval. After a survey for an individual parcel has been approved, the offices shall submit to the BLM: a notice of the approval of such survey; and a copy of such survey and any field notes related to the parcel. After receiving a notice of the approval of a survey related to an individual parcel, the BLM shall provide to each landowner of land adjacent to that parcel: such notice; and a copy of such survey and any field notes related to the parcel.
Title
Red River Gradient Boundary Survey Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - On passage RC# 92 (Y: 250 N: 171 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-02-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-14 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 250 - 171 (Roll no. 92). (text: CR H1154) |
2017-02-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1159-1160) |
2017-02-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 428, the Chair put the question on adoption of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Hanabusa demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the bill until later in the legislative day. |
2017-02-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 428. |
2017-02-14 | House | Rule provides for one hour of debate on each bill, the previous question shall be ordered on each bill without intervening motions except one motion to recommit. Both bills are closed to amendments. |
2017-02-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 99. (consideration: CR H1154-1159) |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-07 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 99 Reported to House. Rule provides for one hour of debate on each bill, the previous question shall be ordered on each bill without intervening motions except one motion to recommit. Both bills are closed to amendments. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR99 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB90 (Related) 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-426. Minority and Supplemental views filed.
SB90 (Related) 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-426. Minority and Supplemental views filed.