US HB4273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to establish the Transit to Trails Grant Program to award grants to certain governmental and private entities for projects that increase transportation access to public lands, waters, parkland, or monuments for critically underserved communities. Among other things, the bill requires DOT to develop transportation planning procedures for projects conducted under the program that are consistent with metropolitan and statewide planning processes, grant recipients to contribute matching funds equal to not less than 100% of the grant amount, grant awards to be at least $25,000 and not more than $500,000, and publicized schedules and routes for transportation systems that are developed after the receipt of a grant under the program.
Title
Transit to Trails Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2467 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5986 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB5986 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
SB4401 (Related) 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Community Development Financial Institutions Fund
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public transit
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public transit
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4273/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4273/BILLS-116hr4273ih.pdf |