US HB4259 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act to require notification with respect to individualized education program teams, and for other purposes.
Title
Think Differently about Education Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202. |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-252. |
2023-09-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 39 - 0. |
2023-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2023-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3536 (Same As) 2023-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.