US HB4258 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-75.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-75.
2019-11-27SenateSigned by President.
2019-11-21SenatePresented to President.
2019-11-20SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-11-19SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6679)
2019-11-14SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-11-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-11-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8796-8797)
2019-11-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4258.
2019-11-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8796-8797)
2019-11-13HouseMr. Stanton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-11-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
2019-11-08HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-278.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-15HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
2019-09-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-09-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-09-09HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback