US SB2511 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently authorizes the Marshal of the Supreme Court and the Supreme Court Police to provide security protection for Supreme Court Justices (and their official guests) and officers and employees of the Supreme Court. Additionally, it permits such protection to be provided in any location—not just in any state.
Title
Reauthorizing Security for Supreme Court Justices Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-10-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.945 Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4258 (Related) 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-75. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Law enforcement officers
Protection of officials
Supreme Court
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Law enforcement officers
Protection of officials
Supreme Court