US HB4240 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 112-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 112-172.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ambassador James R. Lilley and Congressman Stephen J. Solarz North Korea Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2012 - Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States should: (1) continue to seek cooperation from foreign governments to allow the United States to process North Korean refugees overseas for U.S. resettlement, (2) urge China to halt its forcible repatriation of North Koreans, and (3) allow the United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees (UNHCR) access to North Koreans inside China to determine whether such North Koreans are refugees requiring protection. Amends the North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 to authorize appropriations through FY2017: (1) for grants that promote democracy, human rights, and a market economy in North Korea, (2) to increase the availability of non-government controlled information inside North Korea, and (3) for organizations or persons that provide humanitarian assistance to North Koreans who are outside of North Korea. Extends through 2017 the annual congressional reporting requirement for: (1) the Secretary of State to report on activities to increase the availability of non-government controlled information inside North Korea, (2) the Special Envoy for North Korean human rights issues to report on human rights related activities, (3) the Secretary and Administrator of the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to report on U.S. humanitarian assistance inside North Korea and to North Koreans outside of North Korea, and (4) the Secretary and the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to report on the number of North Koreans seeking refugee status or political asylum in the United States. Directs the Broadcasting Board of Governors to report to Congress regarding U.S. broadcasting to North Korea and the extent to which the Board has achieved the goal of 12-hour-per-day broadcasting to North Korea.
Title
Ambassador James R. Lilley and Congressman Stephen J. Solarz North Korea Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. David Rivera [R-FL] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Robert Turner [R-NY] |
Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-172. |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-08-07 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-08-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6006) |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 458. |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. Without written report. |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2012-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2685-2686) |
2012-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4240. |
2012-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2685-2687) |
2012-05-15 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-03-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-03-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR58 (Related) 2012-08-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Freedom of information
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
North Korea
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
South Korea
United Nations
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Freedom of information
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
North Korea
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
South Korea
United Nations