US HB4231 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-535, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-535, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Librarian of Congress to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install the panel among the stained glass panels depicting the seals of States which overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Librarian of Congress, concurrently with the planned renovation and replacement of such panels, to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install it among the existing panels that depict the seals of states that overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building.
Title
To direct the Librarian of Congress to obtain a stained glass panel depicting the seal of the District of Columbia and install the panel among the stained glass panels depicting the seals of States which overlook the Main Reading Room of the Library of Congress Thomas Jefferson Building.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-535, Part I. |
2016-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-20 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2015-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-12-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1762-1763) |
2015-12-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Congress
Congressional agencies
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Library of Congress
National symbols
Congress
Congressional agencies
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Library of Congress
National symbols
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4231/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4231/BILLS-114hr4231ih.pdf |