US HB4183 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-187. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Identifying Barriers and Best Practices Study Act This bill requires the Government Accountability Office to study and report on disability and pension benefits provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs to members of the National Guard and members of reserve components of the Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identifying Barriers and Best Practices Study Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 685 (Y: 408 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-30HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-187. (TXT | PDF)
2020-10-30HouseSigned by President.
2020-10-20HousePresented to President.
2020-10-06SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2020-10-01SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6031)
2019-12-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-12-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 1 (Roll no. 685). (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10271)
2019-12-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10314)
2019-12-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4183.
2019-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10271-10272)
2019-12-16HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-29HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-29HouseSubcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-08-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2019-08-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-08-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3110 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback