US HB4177 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PREPARE Act of 2017 Preparedness and Risk Management for Extreme Weather Patterns Assuring Resilience and Effectiveness Act of 2017 This bill directs the President to establish the Interagency Council on Extreme Weather Resilience, Preparedness, and Risk Identification and Management (council), which shall: (1) establish government-wide goals for extreme weather resilience, preparedness, and risk identification and management (EWR); (2) develop, recommend, coordinate, and track implementation of priority interagency federal government actions related to EWR; (3) provide recommendations to the Council on Environmental Quality, the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), and the Department of Homeland Security on how agencies should develop or update agency extreme weather plans, remove barriers to state and local EWR in agency regulations, guidance, and policy, and avoid duplication among federal activities; (4) issue guidance to agencies on developing agency extreme weather plans and agency regulations, guidance, and policies to remove barriers to state and local EWR; and (5) publish biannually an inventory of all regional agency offices, centers, and programs that assist with EWR at the state or local level. OMB shall ensure that each agency provides adequate resources to the council. Each agency shall submit biannually to OMB and to the council a comprehensive plan that integrates consideration of extreme weather into its operations and overall mission objectives. OMB shall consolidate and submit such plans to Congress. Annual agency performance plans shall include the most recent agency extreme weather plan.
Title
PREPARE Act of 2017 Preparedness and Risk Management for Extreme Weather Patterns Assuring Resilience and Effectiveness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 866. |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-11-14 | House | House Committee on Oversight and Government Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018. |
2018-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1028, Part I. |
2018-04-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations