US HB4081 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the disclosure of a camera or recording capability in certain internet-connected devices.
Title
Informing Consumers about Smart Devices Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to section 10 of H. Res. 1396, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1638, as amended; H.R. 3304, as amended; H.R. 4081, as amended; H.R. 4821, as amended; H.R. 6889, as amended; H.R. 6967, as amended; H.R. 8163, as amended; H.R. 8510, as amended; H.R. 8681, as amended; H.R. 8875, as amended; H.R. 8956; S. 1198; and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 5641. (text: CR H8153-8154) |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1396, proceedings on H.R. 4081 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4081. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8153-8154) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-509. |
2022-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0. |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-23 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 0 . |
2022-06-23 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3898 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
HR1396 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB5127 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR1396 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB5127 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.