US HB4032 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to take into trust 3,400 acres of land in Arizona, known as the Lower Sonoran Lands, for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, a government composed of members of the Pima Tribe and the Maricopa Tribe. After the lands are taken into trust, they must be treated as part of the community's reservation. Gaming is prohibited on the land taken into trust. The bill establishes a fixed, permanent boundary for the reservation's northern boundary. The benefits realized by the community, its members, and allottees under this bill satisfy their claims against the United States in connection with alleged failures relating to: (1) establishing and documenting federal rights-of-way on the reservation; and (2) establishing, maintaining, and defending the northern boundary. The bill establishes, ratifies, documents, and confirms federal rights-of-way and easements within the reservation. Within six years, the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) must publish a survey of each of the federal rights-of-way established under this bill. Upon completion of the surveys, the community and BIA may remove a federal right-of-way.
Title
Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7578) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 699. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-399. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2018-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6340-6341) |
2018-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4032. |
2018-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6340-6342) |
2018-07-17 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 633. |
2018-07-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-817. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Native Americans