US HB4020 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reform United States drug policy, and for other purposes.
Title
Drug Policy Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-06-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Reform, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, House Administration, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4020/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4020/BILLS-117hr4020ih.pdf |