US HB4014 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 112-215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 112-215.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to make the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) a "covered agency" that may share information with another covered agency or any other federal agency without waiving any privilege applicable to the information. Prohibits information submitted to the CFPB in the course of its supervisory or regulatory process from being construed as waiving, destroying, or affecting any privilege that may be claimed with respect to such information under federal or state law as to any person or entity other than the CFPB, another federal banking agency, a state bank supervisor, or a foreign banking authority.
Title
To amend the Federal Deposit Insurance Act with respect to information provided to the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-215. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7751) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 344. |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2012-03-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-03-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1555) |
2012-03-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4014. |
2012-03-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1555-1556) |
2012-03-26 | House | Mrs. Biggert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-03-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287. |
2012-03-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-417. |
2012-02-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2099 (Same As) 2012-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6125 (Related) 2012-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
SB3394 (Related) 2012-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6125 (Related) 2012-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
SB3394 (Related) 2012-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives