US HB4002 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Code Improvement Act of 2015 This bill amends the federal criminal code to establish a default mens rea standard (i.e., a state of mind requirement) for a federal criminal offense whose defining statute does not specify a required state of mind. A conviction for such federal criminal offense requires proof that a defendant acted knowingly. Additionally, if the offense consists of conduct that a reasonable person would not know or have reason to believe was unlawful, then a conviction requires proof that the defendant knew or had reason to believe such conduct was unlawful. Finally, the bill amends the federal judicial code to require the Department of Justice to develop and update, index, and publish an inventory of all federal criminal offenses, including violations of agency rules or regulations that constitute or define federal criminal offenses.
Title
Criminal Code Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 699. |
2016-12-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-889. |
2015-11-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-11-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-11-16 | House | Introduced in House |