US HB3989 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
USA Liberty Act of 2017 Uniting and Strengthening American Liberty Act of 2017
Title
USA Liberty Act of 2017 Uniting and Strengthening American Liberty Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 8. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency. |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2158 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial procedure and administration
National Security Agency
Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Armed forces and national security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial procedure and administration
National Security Agency
Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3989/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3989/BILLS-115hr3989ih.pdf |