US HB3950 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require sellers of event tickets to disclose comprehensive information to consumers about ticket prices and related fees, and for other purposes.
Title
TICKET Act Transparency In Charges for Key Events Ticketing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Val Hoyle [D-OR] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-02 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Related) 2023-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3950/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3950/BILLS-118hr3950ih.pdf |