US HB3935 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to modify the exception from requirements for the operation of vehicles on certain highways in the State of Texas, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting Agricultural Commerce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3935/BILLS-117hr3935ih.pdf |