US HB3902 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2013 - Amends the National Child Protection Act of 1993 to direct the Attorney General to: (1) establish policies and procedures to streamline the process of obtaining state and national criminal history background checks on covered individuals, and (2) establish a criminal history review program to provide covered entities with reliable and accurate information on the criminal history of a covered individual. Defines "covered entity" as any business or organization that provides, or licenses, certifies, or coordinates individuals or organizations to provide, care, care placement, supervision, treatment, education, training, instruction, or recreation to children. Defines "covered individual" as an individual who: (1) has, seeks to have, or may have unsupervised access to vulnerable populations (i.e., elderly, disabled, and children) served by a covered entity; (2) is employed by or volunteers with, or seeks to be employed by or volunteer with, a covered entity; or (3) owns or operates, or seeks to own or operate, a covered entity.
Title
Child Protection Improvements Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1362 (Related) 2013-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2647 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2647 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Aging
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Disability and paralysis
Personnel records
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Disability and paralysis
Personnel records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3902/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3902/BILLS-113hr3902ih.pdf |