US HB3892 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-2)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015 Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Muslim Brotherhood has met the criteria for designation as a foreign terrorist organization, and (2) the Department of State should so designate it. Requires the State Department to report to Congress within 60 days whether the Muslim Brotherhood meets the criteria for foreign terrorist designation and, if not, which criteria have not been met.
Title
Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10. |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-19 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged. |
2015-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2230 (Related) 2015-11-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3892/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3892/BILLS-114hr3892ih.pdf |