US HB3889 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-74. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-74. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the grant supporting the National Community Anti-Drug Coalition Institute. Among other things, the bill also makes technical corrections and repeals a requirement that the Government Accountability Office audit the Office of National Drug Control Policy.
Title
ONDCP Technical Corrections Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-74. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-11-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-11-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6614) |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-10-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8165-8166) |
2019-10-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3889. |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8165-8167) |
2019-10-16 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
Government operations and politics