US HB3878 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Free Credit Freeze Act This bill amends the Fair Credit Reporting Act to prohibit a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing, temporarily lifting, or fully removing a credit freeze. A consumer reporting agency must place a credit freeze on the consumer's file upon a consumer's request, prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from releasing any credit information without the consumer's permission.
Title
Free Credit Freeze Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1810 (Same As) 2017-09-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1816 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-132.
HB3755 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1816 (Related) 2017-10-17 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-132.
HB3755 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3878/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3878/BILLS-115hr3878ih.pdf |