US HB385 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Transportation to make grants for the operation of a clearinghouse to collect, conduct, and fund research on the influences of highly automated vehicles on land use, urban design, transportation, real estate, and municipal budgets, and for other purposes.
Title
PLACE Act Preparing Localities for an Autonomous and Connected Environment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E51) |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/385/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr385/BILLS-117hr385ih.pdf |