US HB3836 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate direct primary care arrangements under Medicaid.
Title
Medicaid Primary Care Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H798-799) |
2024-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3836. |
2024-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H798-800) |
2024-03-05 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-09-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 134. |
2023-09-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-170. |
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 0. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2284 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.