US HB3824 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of the Cahokia Mounds Mississippian Culture National Historical Park in Collinsville, Illinois; Monroe, Madison, and St. Clair Counties, Illinois; and St. Louis City County, Missouri, as a unit of the National Park System. The Department of the Interior may acquire lands and interests within the boundary of the park by donation, purchase, or exchange, except that land owned by such states or their political subdivisions may only be acquired by donation. Interior may enter into cooperative agreements with such states and their political subdivisions, colleges and universities, nonprofit organizations, Indian tribes, and individuals to (1) mark, interpret, and restore nationally significant historic or cultural and natural resources related to the life of the Mississippi culture within the park, if the agreement provides for reasonable public access; and (2) conduct research related to Mississippi culture.
Title
Cahokia Mounds Mississippian Culture National Historical Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7255) |
2019-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2340 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
General Native American affairs matters
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Illinois
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Illinois
Land transfers
Missouri
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3824/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3824/BILLS-116hr3824ih.pdf |