US HB3810 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Senior Citizens Relief Act of 2009 - Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to extend the $250 economic recovery payment payable to certain individuals through calendar year 2010. Applies the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance tax in 2010 to certain earnings in excess of $1.29 million.
Title
Emergency Senior Citizens Relief Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-15 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3597 (Related) 2009-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB1685 (Related) 2009-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1685 (Related) 2009-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Wages and earnings
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3810/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3810/BILLS-111hr3810ih.pdf |