US HB3798 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 539.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 539.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Due Process Restoration Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to authorize a person who is a party to an administrative proceeding brought by the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) under a securities law, and against whom an order imposing a cease and desist order and a penalty may be issued at the conclusion of the proceeding, to require the SEC to terminate the proceeding. If a person requires the SEC to terminate a proceeding, the SEC may bring a civil action against that person for the same remedy that might have been imposed. A legal or equitable remedy may be imposed on a person against whom an administrative proceeding was brought only upon a showing by the SEC of clear and convincing evidence that the person has violated the relevant provision of law.
Title
Due Process Restoration Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 539. |
2016-07-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-697. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 25. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-12-02 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral. |
2015-10-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Evidence and witnesses
Finance and financial sector
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Civil actions and liability
Evidence and witnesses
Finance and financial sector
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)