US HB3792 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to support the development and implementation of programs using data analysis to identify and facilitate strategies to improve outcomes for children in geographic areas with a high prevalence of trauma from exposure to adverse childhood experiences, and for other purposes.
Title
STRONG Support for Children Act of 2021 Services and Trauma-informed Research of Outcomes in Neighborhoods Grants for Support for Children Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7585 (Related) 2022-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3792/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3792/BILLS-117hr3792ih.pdf |