US HB3746 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Business of Insurance Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 This bill amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to revise the authority of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) over activities regulated by a state insurance regulator. The CFPB may not enforce the Act against any person regulated by a state insurance regulator and offering a consumer financial product or service, to the extent that person is engaged in the business of insurance. If a person engaged in the business of insurance is regulated by a state insurance regulator but otherwise subject to the Act, the CFPB must construe its authority narrowly.
Title
Business of Insurance Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-668. |
2018-01-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 18. |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2702 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation