US HB3743 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To increase funding for the Reagan-Udall Foundation for the Food and Drug Administration and for the Foundation for the National Institutes of Health.
Title
Supporting the Foundation for the National Institutes of Health and the Reagan-Udall Foundation for the Food and Drug Administration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 374 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181. |
2021-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 52 (Roll no. 424). |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7542) |
2021-11-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3743. |
2021-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6694-6695; text: CR H6694) |
2021-11-30 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-11-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133. |
2021-11-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-183. |
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1662 (Same As) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-101.