US HB3734 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires (1) the Small Business Administration to report on the veterans interagency task force; and (2) the Government Accountability Office to report on access to credit for small businesses owned and controlled by veterans, Reservists, or their spouses.
Title
SERV Act Successful Entrepreneurship for Reservists and Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 614 (Y: 421 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 614). (text: CR H8803) |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8813-8814) |
2019-11-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3734. |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8803-8805) |
2019-11-13 | House | Mr. Schneider moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 185. |
2019-10-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-233. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Credit and credit markets
Government lending and loan guarantees
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Credit and credit markets
Government lending and loan guarantees
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs