US HB3731 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-160. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Overtime Pay for Protective Services Act of 2016 to extend through 2018, subject to specified limitations, the exemption of U.S. Secret Service officers, employees, and agents who perform protective services from the limitation on premium pay otherwise applicable to federal employees. The bill specifies that the exemption also applies to the U.S. Secret Service Uniformed Division. The bill provides that such amendments shall take effect as if they had been enacted on December 31, 2016. The Secret Service must report to Congress by January 30, 2018, and January 30, 2019, on premium pay above the limitation paid to Secret Service personnel in the previous year. (Sec. 3) The Government Accountability Office shall study and report to specified congressional committees on the extent of the progress made by the Secret Service in implementing the recommendations of the U.S. Secret Service Protective Mission Panel, including those items which pertain to training and personnel enumerated in the Executive Summary to Report from the panel to the Secretary of Homeland Security, dated December 15, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 655 (Y: 407 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-160. (TXT | PDF)
2018-04-03SenateSigned by President.
2018-03-22SenatePresented to President.
2018-03-21SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-21SenateOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1751)
2018-03-21SenateMr. Gowdy asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1751)
2018-03-20SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-03-19SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1796)
2018-03-19SenateS.Amdt.2214 Amendment SA 2214 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-03-19SenateS.Amdt.2214 Amendment SA 2214 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. In the nature of a substitute.
2018-03-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1796)
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2017-12-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-12-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 655). (text: CR H9633)
2017-12-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9639-9640)
2017-12-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-12-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3731.
2017-12-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9633-9637)
2017-12-05HouseMr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-12-04HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-435, Part I.
2017-09-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-09-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-09-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback