US HB3705 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to collaborate with veterans service organizations to write a standard letter to be provided to individuals who owe debts to the VA. Such letter shall be written in plain language and shall include a notice of the debt and a clear explanation of: (1) why the individual owes such money, and (2) available options. The VA shall develop a method by which individuals may elect to receive debt notification letters by electronic means and shall ensure that the letter is delivered: (1) by both standard mail and electronic means to individuals who have made such election, and (2) only by standard mail to individuals who have not made such election. The VA shall: (1) notify Congress regarding the completion of such letter, and (2) study and report to Congress on the process by which it notifies veterans of debt collection efforts.
Title
Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 621 (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 621). (text: 11/7/2017 CR H8561) |
2017-11-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8643) |
2017-11-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3705. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8561-8562) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 293. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-397. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-09-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2884 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Postal service
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Postal service
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' organizations and recognition