US HB3702 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Dingell-Johnson Sport Fish Restoration Act with respect to sport fish restoration and recreational boating safety, and for other purposes.
Title
Sport Fish Restoration, Recreational Boating Safety, and Wildlife Restoration Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1995 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
SB1995 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 218.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3702/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3702/BILLS-117hr3702ih.pdf |