US HB3681 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Director of the United States Geological Survey to establish a program to map zones that are at greater risk of sinkhole formation, and for other purposes.
Title
Sinkhole Mapping Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-677. |
2022-12-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-12-08 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2022-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |