US HB3652 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the work opportunity credit permanent. This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the termination date for the work opportunity tax credit, thus making such credit permanent.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the work opportunity credit permanent.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-08-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2457 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1247-1248)
HB5164 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6467 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5164 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6467 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3652/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3652/BILLS-115hr3652ih.pdf |