US SB2457 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1247-1248)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1247-1248)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs and Childcare for Military Families Act of 2018 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a work opportunity tax credit for hiring a qualified military spouse. A "qualified military spouse" is the spouse or domestic partner (as recognized under state law or by the Armed Forces) of a member of the Armed Forces. The bill also requires the Department of Defense and the Department of Homeland Security (with respect to the Coast Guard) to implement flexible spending arrangements that permit members of the Armed Forces to use basic pay and compensation to pay for childcare services for their dependent children on a pre-tax basis.
Title
Jobs and Childcare for Military Families Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1247-1248) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2318 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3652 (Related) 2017-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB885 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3652 (Related) 2017-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB885 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2457/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2457/BILLS-115s2457is.pdf |