US HB3645 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish emergency grants to safeguard essential health care workers, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish emergency grants to safeguard essential health care workers, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Summer Lee [D-PA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Greg Casar [D-TX] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] |
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] | Rep. Valerie Foushee [D-NC] | Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] |
Rep. Robert Garcia [D-CA] | Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Jennifer McClellan [D-VA] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Becca Balint [D-VT] |
Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2764 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1767 (Related) 2023-05-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1229 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1767 (Related) 2023-05-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1229 (Related) 2023-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3645/BILLS-118hr3645ih.pdf |