US HB3641 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases civil and administrative monetary penalties for securities laws violations. The bill also adds a fourth tier of monetary penalties for violations by a person that, within the five-year period preceding the violation (1) was criminally convicted for securities fraud; or (2) became subject to a judgment or order imposing monetary, equitable, or administrative relief in a Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) action alleging fraud. In addition, the bill expands penalties for violations of certain federal court injunctions or SEC orders.
Title
Stronger Enforcement of Civil Penalties Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-410. |
2019-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 25. |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1854 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (S3481-3482)
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Securities
Civil actions and liability
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Securities