US HB3629 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) must regulate credit score models by establishing standards for validating the accuracy and predictive value of these models. The bill also gives the CFPB the authority to prohibit the use of certain factors in credit score models. The CFPB must report on the impact of the inclusion of nontraditional data in these models.
Title
Clarity in Credit Score Formation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248. |
2019-11-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-307. |
2019-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 25. |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3621 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Credit and credit markets
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Low- and moderate-income housing
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wages and earnings
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Credit and credit markets
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Low- and moderate-income housing
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wages and earnings