US HB3608 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exempt amounts paid for aircraft management services from the excise taxes imposed on transportation by air. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt from the excise tax on transportation of persons and property by air amounts paid by an aircraft owner or lessee for aircraft management services related to maintenance and support of the aircraft or flights on such aircraft. Aircraft management services include assisting an aircraft owner with administrative and support services; obtaining insurance; maintenance, storage and fueling of aircraft; hiring, training, and provision of pilots and crew; establishing and complying with safety standards; or other services necessary to support flights operated by an aircraft owner. In the case of an aircraft owner that is wholly-owned by another person, amounts paid by the other person on behalf of the aircraft owner must be treated as having been paid directly by the aircraft owner.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exempt amounts paid for aircraft management services from the excise taxes imposed on transportation by air.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 618. |
2016-09-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-793. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2092 (Same As) 2015-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.