US HB3607 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To support and fund the Federal procurement of clean energy products, and for other purposes.
Title
Buy Green Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1925 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3607/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3607/BILLS-117hr3607ih.pdf |