US HB360 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy to establish a voluntary Cyber Sense program to test the cybersecurity of products and technologies intended for use in the bulk-power system. The bulk-power system includes facilities and control systems necessary for operating an interconnected electric energy transmission network.
Title
Cyber Sense Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4968) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 360. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4968-4969) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 204. |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-256. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4795 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Crime prevention
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Technology assessment
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Crime prevention
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Technology assessment