US HB3530 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses licensure and employment requirements for medical providers of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Specifically, for VA medical provider positions that require a person to prescribe controlled substances, the bill prohibits a person from being employed if their Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA) registration has been terminated, revoked, or surrendered, and they have not received a waiver from the DEA. The bill also requires the VA to take prompt adverse personnel actions against a medical provider employee (1) who is not licensed, registered, certified, or in receipt of a DEA waiver; or (2) who does not promptly notify the VA of any suspension in such license, registration, or certification. Additionally, the VA must conduct biennial audits of medical provider employees to ensure they are licensed, registered, or certified as required. The VA shall ensure that the hiring process includes a request for licensure status and a verification of licensure status before an individual begins employment. Finally, the VA shall provide annual training on these licensure and employment requirements to directors of the Veterans Integrated Service Networks, as well as chiefs of staff and directors of VA health care facilities.
Title
Improving Confidence in Veterans' Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 686 (Y: 409 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 1 (Roll no. 686). (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10272-10273) |
2019-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10314-10315) |
2019-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3530. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10272-10275) |
2019-12-16 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care quality
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care quality
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care