US HB3471 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-256.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Mobility Safety Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that an eligible disabled veteran provided an automobile or other conveyance is given the opportunity to make personal selections relating to such conveyance. (Sec. 3) The VA shall develop a comprehensive policy regarding quality standards for providers of modification services to veterans under the automobile adaptive equipment program. Such policy shall cover: (1) management of the automobile adaptive equipment program, (2) development and application of safety and quality standards for equipment and installation, (3) provider certification by a third party organization or manufacturer, (4) education and training of VA personnel, (5) provider compliance with the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, and (6) allowance for veterans to receive modifications at their residence or location of choice. The VA shall: (1) within one year and at least every six years thereafter, update VHA Handbook 1173.4 in accordance with such policy; and (2) within one year of such update and biennially thereafter through 2022, report on policy implementation and facility compliance. The VA shall: (1) develop and revise such policy in consultation with veteran service organizations, the National Highway Transportation Administration, industry representatives, manufacturers of automobile adaptive equipment, and other entities with relevant expertise; and (2) ensure against the use of a certifying entity that has a financial conflict of interest regarding the certification of an eligible provider. (Sec. 4) The VA may appoint licensed hearing aid specialists to the Veterans Health Administration. The VA shall ensure that: (1) a hearing aid specialist may only perform hearing services consistent with the specialist's state license related to the practice of fitting and dispensing hearing aids, without excluding other qualified professionals from rendering services in overlapping practice areas; (2) services provided to veterans by hearing aid specialists shall be provided as part of the non-medical treatment plan developed by an audiologist; and (3) VA medical facilities provide veterans with access to the full range of audiologist services. The VA shall, within one year and annually thereafter for the next five years, report on: (1) veterans access to such hearing health services; and (2) VA contracting policies for providing hearing health services to veterans in non-VA facilities, including the number of veterans referred to audiologists and hearing aid specialists.
Title
Veterans Mobility Safety Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-256. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H6354-6355) |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Mrs. Walorski asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H6353-6355) |
2016-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.5111 Amendment SA 5111 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.5111 Amendment SA 5111 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S6493) |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6493) |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5277-5278) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3471. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5277-5279) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 548. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-709. |
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Motor vehicles
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Disability and paralysis
Motor vehicles
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation